EP0427914 - Shelf [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.10.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.1994 | Refusal of application | published on 23.11.1994 [1994/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Element-System Rudolf Bohnacker Metallwarenfabrik Stettiner Strasse 1 D-89616 Rottenacker / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/21] | For all designated states Element-System Rudolf Bohnacker Metallwarenfabrik Stettiner Strasse 1 D-89616 Rottenacker / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bohnacker, Rudolf Lindenstrasse 34 D-7935 Rottenacker / DE | [1991/21] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/21] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90112269.7 | 27.06.1990 | [1991/21] | Priority number, date | DE19890013571U | 16.11.1989 Original published format: DE 8913571 U | [1991/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0427914 | Date: | 22.05.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A47B96/06, A47B96/02, A47B65/00 | [1991/21] | CPC: |
A47B96/00 (EP);
A47B65/10 (US);
A47B47/022 (EP);
A47B63/00 (EP);
A47B65/20 (US);
A47B96/028 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/21] | Title | German: | Regal | [1991/21] | English: | Shelf | [1991/21] | French: | Etagère | [1991/21] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 20.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/21] | 22.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.06.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1994/47] | 03.07.1994 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1994/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1994 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CH446645 (SCHAEFER KG FRITZ [DE]); | [X]FR1550275 ; | [A]AU429860B |