Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] |
23.02.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.04.1993 [1993/15] |
14.01.1992 | Request for examination filed | published on 04.03.1992 [1992/10] |
14.05.1991 | Publication of search report | published on 03.07.1991 [1991/27] |
25.04.1991 | Change - classification | published on 12.06.1991 [1991/24] |
26.01.1991 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 13.03.1991 [1991/11] |