EP0416234 - Electrophoresis apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.02.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto CA 94304-1112 / US | ||
Former [1991/11] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company Mail Stop 20 B-O, 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gordon, Gary Babcock 21112 Bank Mill Road Saratoga, CA 95070 / US | [1991/11] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Roland, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | Liesegang, Roland, Dr.-Ing., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90112470.1 | 29.06.1990 | [1991/11] | Priority number, date | US19890402931 | 05.09.1989 Original published format: US 402931 | [1991/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0416234 | Date: | 13.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0416234 | Date: | 03.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/26, G01N27/447 | [1991/24] | CPC: |
G01N27/44704 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1991/11] | G01N27/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/11] | Title | German: | Elektroforesegerät | [1991/11] | English: | Electrophoresis apparatus | [1991/11] | French: | Appareil d'électrophorèse | [1991/11] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 23.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/10] | 18.02.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3820660 ; | [A]US3298527 ; | [A]US3479277 | [Y] - JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY. vol. 255, 1983, AMSTERDAM NL pages 359 - 379; C. GIDDINGS ET AL: "Capillary liquid chromatography in field flow fractionation-type channels" | [Y] - ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY. vol. 60, no. 21, November 1988, COLUMBUS US pages 2322 - 2328; R.M. McCORMICK: "Capillary zone electrophoretic separation of peptides and proteins using low pH buffers in modified silica capillaries" | [A] - JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY. vol. 142, 1977, AMSTERDAM NL pages 39 - 56; D.H. DESTY ET AL: "Non-circular capillary columns for gas chromatography" |