EP0405593 - High frequency signal measuring equipment with cabled detecting and signal companding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.1996 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.05.1996 [1996/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ANRITSU CORPORATION 5-10-27, Minamiazabu Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/01] | For all designated states ANRITSU CORPORATION 5-10-27, Minamiazabu Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tagiri, Osamu 1532, Hase Atsugi-Shi, Kanagawa-Ken 243 / JP | [1991/01] | Representative(s) | Sajda, Wolf E., et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/01] | Sajda, Wolf E., Dipl.-Phys., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 48 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90112480.0 | 29.06.1990 | [1991/01] | Priority number, date | JP19890169377 | 30.06.1989 Original published format: JP 16937789 | [1991/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0405593 | Date: | 02.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0405593 | Date: | 27.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0405593 | Date: | 17.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01R27/28, G01R21/01 | [1991/52] | CPC: |
G01R27/28 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/01] | G01R27/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1991/01] | Title | German: | Hochfrequenzmesseinrichtung mit verkabelter Messwerterfassung und Signal-Kompandierung | [1991/01] | English: | High frequency signal measuring equipment with cabled detecting and signal companding | [1991/01] | French: | Dispositif de mesure par haute fréquence avec traitement des données câblées et compression de signal | [1991/01] | Examination procedure | 29.06.1990 | Examination requested [1991/01] | 16.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0176019 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]); | [A]US4114115 (MINNIS THOMAS R) | [A] - TOUTE L'ELECTRONIQUE. no. 500, January 1985, PARIS FR pages 32 - 37; "L'Analyse de réseau hyperfréquences" | [A] - International Journal of Infrared and Millimeter Waves vol. 9, no. 11, November 1988, New York, US pages 971 - 981; B.ROTH et al.: "An Electronical System for Real-Time Measurement of the Logarithmic Magnitude of Scattering Parameters" | [A] - NACHRICHTEN ELEKTRONIK. vol. 32, no. 11, November 1978, HEIDELBERG DE pages 366 - 368; H.FRIEDBERG: "Frequenzgang-Messungen mit mehr als 100 dB Dynamikbereich" |