EP0411336 - Cooling element for shaft furnace [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.04.1995 [1995/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Gutehoffnungshütte Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 11 02 40 46122 Oberhausen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/06] | For all designated states MAN Gutehoffnungshütte Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 11 02 40 D-46122 Oberhausen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kämmerling, Bruno Albrecht-Dürer-Str. 18 W-4220 Dinslaken / DE | 02 /
Spickermann, Karl Georgstr. 29 W-4269 Dorsten / DE | 03 /
Steiner, Urs-Peter Klosterstr. 9 d W-4060 Viersen / DE | [1991/06] | Application number, filing date | 90112721.7 | 04.07.1990 | [1991/06] | Priority number, date | DE19893925280 | 31.07.1989 Original published format: DE 3925280 | [1991/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0411336 | Date: | 06.02.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0411336 | Date: | 13.04.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C21B7/10 | [1991/06] | CPC: |
C21B7/10 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4935 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU [1991/06] | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitsdurchströmtes Kühlelement für Schachtöfen | [1991/06] | English: | Cooling element for shaft furnace | [1991/06] | French: | Panneau de refroidissement pour four à cuve | [1991/06] | Examination procedure | 09.01.1991 | Examination requested [1991/11] | 17.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP63035708 ; | [XP]JP2047211 ; | [A]GB1571789 (BROWN & SONS LTD JAMES) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 12, Nr. 248 (C-511)[3095], 13. Juli 1988; & JP-A-63-035 708 (NIPPON STEEL CORP.) 16-02-1988, & JP63035708 A 00000000 | [XP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 14, Nr. 211 (C-715)[4154], 2. Mai 1990; & JP-A-2-047 211 (KAWASAKI STEEL CORP.) 16-02-1990, & JP2047211 A 00000000 |