EP0464243 - Oxygen sensor with semiconducting gallium oxide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.06.1996 [1996/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fleischer, Maximilian, Dipl.-Phys. Dachauerstrasse 265 D-8000 München 19 / DE | 02 /
Hanrieder, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Phys. Winkstrasse 8 D-8000 München 70 / DE | 03 /
Meixner, Hans, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Max-Planck-Strasse 5 D-8013 Haar / DE | [1992/02] | Application number, filing date | 90112780.3 | 04.07.1990 | [1992/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0464243 | Date: | 08.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0464243 | Date: | 14.06.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/12 | [1992/02] | CPC: |
G01N27/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1992/11] |
Former [1992/02] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Sauerstoffsensor mit halbleitendem Galliumoxid | [1992/02] | English: | Oxygen sensor with semiconducting gallium oxide | [1992/02] | French: | Capteur d'oxygène avec oxyde de gallium semi-conducteur | [1992/02] | Examination procedure | 05.12.1990 | Examination requested [1992/02] | 05.07.1991 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, DK, ES, GR, LU, NL, SE | 14.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.08.1991 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.08.1991 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.08.1991 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 14.08.1991 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.08.1991 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.08.1991 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 14.08.1991 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3961248 (KAWAMURA MASANORI); | [A]FR2298104 (NAT RES DEV [GB]); | [Y]FR2393302 (MAGNETI MARELLI SPA [IT]); | [A]EP0046989 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]US4500412 (TAKAHASHI HIDEAKI [JP], et al); | [Y]EP0364315 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) |