EP0406878 - Near-end echo attenuation device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/02] | Nean-end echo attenuation device | ||
[1995/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.1996 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.04.1996 [1996/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsches Zentrum für Luft- und Raumfahrt e.V. Linder Höhe 51147 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/02] | For all designated states Deutsche Forschungsanstalt für Luft- und Raumfahrt e.V. Postfach 90 60 58 D-51126 Köln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moreira, Joao Ludwig-Ganghofer-Strasse 24 D-8910 Landsberg / DE | [1991/02] | Representative(s) | von Kirschbaum, Albrecht Patentanwalt Postfach 1520 82102 Germering / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/02] | von Kirschbaum, Albrecht, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Postfach 15 20 D-82102 Germering / DE | Application number, filing date | 90112923.9 | 06.07.1990 | [1991/02] | Priority number, date | DE19893922429 | 07.07.1989 Original published format: DE 3922429 | [1991/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0406878 | Date: | 09.01.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0406878 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0406878 | Date: | 12.04.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/34, G01S13/90 | [1991/43] | CPC: |
G01S7/34 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/02] | G01S7/34 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1991/02] | Title | German: | Nahecho-Dämpfungseinrichtung | [1995/15] | English: | Near-end echo attenuation device | [1995/15] | French: | Dispositif d'atténuation d'échos proches | [1991/02] |
Former [1991/02] | Nahecho-Dämpfunseinrichtung | ||
Former [1991/02] | Nean-end echo attenuation device | Examination procedure | 30.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/04] | 30.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP6058570 ; | [A]US4194200 (GOLDIE HARRY [US]); | [A]US4509050 (AMOROSO JR SALVATORE [US], et al); | [A]EP0225787 (RAYTHEON CO [US]) | [X] - IEEE IGARSS'88, Edinburgh, 12. - 16. September 1988, Band 1, Seiten 23-24, IEEE, New York, NY, US; J.A. MOREIRA et al.: "Real-time adaptive radiometric correction for imaging radar systems" | [AD] - IEEE PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1988 NATIONAL RADAR CONFERENCE CCRS C/X AIRBORNE SYNTHETIC APERTURE RADAR, Ann Arbor, Michigan, 20. - 21. April 1988, Seiten 15-21, IEEE, New York, NY, US; C.E. LIVINGSTON et al.: "CCRS C/X-airborne synthetic aperture radar: An R and D tool for the ERS-1 time frame" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 9, Nr. 190, (P-378), 7. August 1985; & JP-A-60 58 570 (MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K.) 04-04-1985, & JP6058570 A 00000000 |