EP0409020 - Device for squeezing tubes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fresenius AG Gluckensteinweg 5 61350 Bad Homburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/04] | For all designated states Fresenius AG Gluckensteinweg 5 D-61350 Bad Homburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Flaig, Hans-Jürgen, Dr. Kantstrasse 11 D-6420 Lauterbach / DE | 02 /
Jahn, Paul Leo-Tostoi-Strasse 10 D-6000 Frankfurt am Main 56 / DE | [1991/04] | Representative(s) | Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Fuchs Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1991/04] | Dr. Fuchs, Dr. Luderschmidt Dr. Mehler, Dipl.-Ing. Weiss Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 D-65036 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 90112996.5 | 07.07.1990 | [1991/04] | Priority number, date | DE19893923837 | 19.07.1989 Original published format: DE 3923837 | [1991/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0409020 | Date: | 23.01.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0409020 | Date: | 21.09.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F16K7/06, F16H25/12, A61M39/00 | [1991/04] | CPC: |
A61M39/28 (EP,US);
Y10T74/1896 (EP,US);
Y10T74/2107 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1991/04] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Klemmen von Schläuchen | [1991/04] | English: | Device for squeezing tubes | [1991/04] | French: | Dispositif pour serrer un tuyau | [1991/04] | Examination procedure | 16.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/16] | 20.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.1993 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.10.1993 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 02.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0319274 (PACESETTER INFUSION LTD [US]); | [A]US3550619 (HALASZ PETER ROBERT, et al); | [A]US4303222 (CAMPBELL JAMES A); | [A]US4640144 (MCLENDON MARTIN [US]); | [AD]GB2071222 (ANDROS INC); | [A]DE3515855 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) |