EP0407928 - Device for realising the transition between two juxtaposed floor coverings of different thickness [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.1995 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.1995 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 02.08.1995 [1995/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schlüter-Systems GmbH Schmölestrasse 7 D-58640 Iserlohn / DE | [1994/06] |
Former [1991/03] | For all designated states Schlüter, Werner Am Schierloh 6 D-58644 Iserlohn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schlüter, Werner Am Schierloh 6 W-5860 Iserlohn / DE | [1994/24] |
Former [1991/03] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Schröter, Martin Schröter & Haverkamp Im Tückwinkel 22 58636 Iserlohn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/03] | Schröter, Martin, Dipl.-Ing. Im Tückwinkel 22 D-58636 Iserlohn / DE | Application number, filing date | 90113044.3 | 08.07.1990 | [1991/03] | Priority number, date | DE19893922927 | 12.07.1989 Original published format: DE 3922927 | [1991/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0407928 | Date: | 16.01.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0407928 | Date: | 17.02.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0407928 | Date: | 15.06.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | E04F19/02 | [1991/03] | CPC: |
E04F19/061 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1991/03] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Ausbildung des Überganges zwischen zwei aneinandergrenzenden Bodenbelägen unterschiedlicher Höhe | [1991/03] | English: | Device for realising the transition between two juxtaposed floor coverings of different thickness | [1991/03] | French: | Dispositif pour aménager la transition entre deux revêtements de sol juxtaposés de hauteurs différentes | [1991/03] | Examination procedure | 13.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/11] | 06.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1993 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   09.09.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 15.06.1994 | CH | 31.07.1994 | LI | 31.07.1994 | [1995/31] |
Former [1995/13] | NL | 15.06.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE7519945U ; | [A]US2644977 (JUNE SAMUEL P); | [A]DE3420805 (KUENNE HERMANN FRIEDRICH KG [DE]); | [AD]DE8717225U |