EP0407950 - Formal compounds, fuel oil additives, and fuel oil compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.12.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.02.1995 [1995/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON OIL AND FATS COMPANY, LIMITED 10-1, Yuraku-cho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/03] | For all designated states NIPPON OIL AND FATS COMPANY, LIMITED 10-1, Yuraku-cho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Izaiku, Hiroumi 4628-13, Endoh Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Akimoto, Shin-ichi 1326-28, Zushi-machi Machida-shi, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Ishizaki, Takaharu 2-8-19, Oshonishi-machi Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo / JP | 04 /
Kubo, Yoshifumi 8-5-3-333, Funakoshi-cho Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 05 /
Yasukohchi, Tohru 2-3-10-404, Fujisaki, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-chi, Kanagawa / JP | [1991/03] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/03] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90113109.4 | 10.07.1990 | [1991/03] | Priority number, date | JP19890175532 | 10.07.1989 Original published format: JP 17553289 | [1991/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0407950 | Date: | 16.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0407950 | Date: | 09.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07C217/08, C10L1/22, C08G65/32 | [1991/03] | CPC: |
C10L1/2225 (EP,US);
C07C217/50 (EP,US);
C08G65/33396 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/03] | Title | German: | Formalverbindungen, Kraftstoffzusätze und Kraftstoffmischungen | [1991/03] | English: | Formal compounds, fuel oil additives, and fuel oil compositions | [1991/03] | French: | Formals, produits d'addition au carburant et compositions de carburant | [1991/03] | Examination procedure | 28.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 27.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 05.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 10.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4527996 (CAMPBELL CURTIS B [US]); | [A]EP0310875 (BASF AG [DE]) |