blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0409047

EP0409047 - Method of manufacturing a vacuum interrupter chamber [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.07.1995
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip22.07.1995No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.09.1995 [1995/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CALOR-EMAG ELEKTRIZITÄTS-AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Bahnstrasse 39-47
D-40878 Ratingen / DE
[1991/04]
Inventor(s)01 / Lipperts, Joseph
Tiberiuslaan 4
NL-5926 TH Venlo / NL
02 / Bieber, Martin
Raiffeisenstrasse 6
D-4270 Dorsten / DE
03 / Pilsinger, Günter
Ruhrtalstrasse 4
D-4000 Düsseldorf / DE
[1991/04]
Representative(s)Rupprecht, Klaus, et al
c/o ABB Patent GmbH
Postfach 10 03 51
68128 Mannheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/40]Rupprecht, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al
c/o ABB Patent GmbH, Postfach 10 03 51
D-68128 Mannheim / DE
Former [1991/04]Rupprecht, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing.
c/o ABB Patent GmbH, Postfach 10 03 51
D-68128 Mannheim / DE
Application number, filing date90113141.710.07.1990
[1991/04]
Priority number, dateDE1989392661911.08.1989         Original published format: DE 3926619
DE1989392352815.07.1989         Original published format: DE 3923528
[1991/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0409047
Date:23.01.1991
Language:DE
[1991/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0409047
Date:03.06.1992
Language:DE
[1992/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0409047
Date:21.09.1994
Language:DE
[1994/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.04.1992
ClassificationIPC:H01H11/00, H01H33/66, C04B37/02
[1991/04]
CPC:
C04B37/006 (EP); C04B37/026 (EP); H01H33/66207 (EP);
C04B2237/125 (EP); C04B2237/126 (EP); C04B2237/32 (EP);
C04B2237/403 (EP); C04B2237/406 (EP); C04B2237/407 (EP);
H01H11/00 (EP); H01H2033/66215 (EP); H01H2033/66276 (EP);
H01H2033/66292 (EP); H01H33/66261 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT,   NL [1991/04]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Vakuumschaltkammer[1991/04]
English:Method of manufacturing a vacuum interrupter chamber[1991/04]
French:Procédé de fabrication d'une chambre d'un interrupteur à vide[1991/04]
Examination procedure23.06.1992Examination requested  [1992/34]
08.03.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
24.03.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.05.1994Fee for grant paid
05.05.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.06.1995No opposition filed within time limit [1995/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.05.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
15.07.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AD]DD134693  (BAHDER HANS PETER, et al);
 [A]DE3628174  (CALOR EMAG ELEKTRIZITAETS AG [DE]);
 [A]DE3008460  (HAZEMEIJER BV);
 [A]DD135661  (GEBAUER ECKEHARD, et al);
 [A]CH242550  (PATELHOLD PATENTVERWERTUNG [CH])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.