EP0418485 - Floor coating agent applying machine and construction of its applying unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/13] | Floor coating agent applying machine and its applying unit construction | ||
[1994/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.1995 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.09.1995 [1995/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PENGUIN WAX CO., LTD. 3-10-14, Higashinakamoto, Higashinari-ku Osaka 537 / JP | [1991/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yonehara, Takashi Yonban-cho Heights 202, 3-banchi, Yonban-cho Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Yata, Yasuo 9-ban 65-go, 2-chome, Kokoso Higashi Yokkaichi-shi, Mie-ken / JP | 03 /
Matsumoto, Yasuhiko 3-5, 2-chome, Akota-cho Saidaiji, Narashi / JP | [1991/13] | Representative(s) | Brommer, Hans Joachim, et al Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Bismarckstrasse 16 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/13] | Brommer, Hans Joachim, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Lemcke Dr.-Ing. H.J. Brommer, Postfach 40 26 D-76025 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 90113223.3 | 11.07.1990 | [1991/13] | Priority number, date | JP19890240353 | 16.09.1989 Original published format: JP 24035389 | JP19890240354 | 16.09.1989 Original published format: JP 24035489 | [1991/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0418485 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0418485 | Date: | 28.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A47L11/12, B05C17/00 | [1994/39] | CPC: |
A47L11/4036 (EP);
A47L11/12 (EP);
A47L11/4069 (EP);
A47L11/4083 (EP);
A47L11/4088 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1991/13] | A47L11/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/13] | Title | German: | Maschine zum Aufbringen eines Überzugs auf Fussböden und Konstruktion derselben | [1994/39] | English: | Floor coating agent applying machine and construction of its applying unit | [1994/39] | French: | Machine d'application d'un agent de revêtement de sol et son mode de construction | [1991/13] |
Former [1991/13] | Maschine zum Anbringen eines Überzugs auf Fussbödenbeläge und Konstruktion derselben | ||
Former [1991/13] | Floor coating agent applying machine and its applying unit construction | Examination procedure | 02.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/27] | 05.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2447172 [ ]; | DE1101709 [ ]; | US3655444 [ ]; | US3657759 [ ]; | US3972088 [ ] |