EP0410215 - Ladder with an upper an a lower section [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.1993 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.05.1993 [1993/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/05] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY 1 John Deere Road Moline, Illinois 61265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peiler, Rolf, Dipl.-Ing. Heiligentalstrasse 11 D-6660 Zweibrücken / DE | 02 /
Schmitt, Wilfried Kiefernstrasse 14 D-6653 Blieskastel / DE | [1991/05] | Representative(s) | Feldmann, Bernhard, et al DEERE & COMPANY European Office Patent Department 68140 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/05] | Feldmann, Bernhard, et al DEERE & COMPANY European Office Patent Department D-68140 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 90113312.4 | 12.07.1990 | [1991/05] | Priority number, date | DE19893925033 | 28.07.1989 Original published format: DE 3925033 | [1991/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0410215 | Date: | 30.01.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | E06C5/02, B63B27/14 | [1991/05] | CPC: |
B63B27/146 (EP);
E06C5/02 (EP);
B63B2027/141 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT [1991/05] | Title | German: | Leiter mit einem oberen und einem unteren Sprossenteil | [1991/05] | English: | Ladder with an upper an a lower section | [1991/05] | French: | Echelle à tronçons supérieur et inférieur | [1991/05] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 18.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/07] | 27.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/19] | 11.12.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4139078 ; | [X]US4161997 ; | [Y]DE3132294 ; | [Y]FR1223933 ; | [A]GB191006943 ; | [A]GB643222 |