EP0409075 - Lever fastener [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.1995 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.05.1995 [1995/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bergmeister, Karl-Heinz Hülstrung 15 D-42799 Leichlingen / DE | [1991/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bergmeister, Karl-Heinz Hülstrung 26 D-5653 Leichlingen / DE | 02 /
Lebold, Willi Silberwaldstrasse 2 D-7000 Stuttgart 75 / DE | [1991/04] | Representative(s) | Lewandowsky, Klaus WinterLewandowsky Patentanwälte Kirchstrasse 4/6 70364 Winnenden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/04] | Lewandowsky, Klaus Krummenacker Strasse 223 D-73733 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 90113314.0 | 12.07.1990 | [1991/04] | Priority number, date | DE19893923467 | 15.07.1989 Original published format: DE 3923467 | [1991/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0409075 | Date: | 23.01.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0409075 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0409075 | Date: | 18.05.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | E05B3/04 | [1991/42] | CPC: |
E05C3/045 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1991/04] | E05C3/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [1991/04] | Title | German: | Hebelverschluss | [1991/04] | English: | Lever fastener | [1991/04] | French: | Verrou à levier | [1991/04] | Examination procedure | 21.04.1992 | Examination requested [1993/09] | 01.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 26.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.07.1990 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   25.07.1990 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 14.05.1992 | M01   Fee paid on   13.06.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]NL56111C ; | [AD]DE8105158U ; | [AP]DE3842363 (BERGMEISTER KARL HEINZ [DE]) |