EP0408083 - Aggressive liquids dosage membrane pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vukicevic, Dragutin II Bulevar 27/X YU-11070 Novi Beograd / YU | [1991/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/03] | Representative(s) | Fehners, Klaus Friedrich, et al Patentanwälte Geyer, Fehners & Partner Perhamerstrasse 31 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/34] | Fehners, Klaus Friedrich, et al Patentanwälte Geyer & Fehners Perhamerstrasse 31 D-80687 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/03] | Fehners, Klaus Friedrich, Dipl.-Ing., Dipl.-Wirtsch.-Ing. Patentanwälte GEYER & FEHNERS Perhamerstrasse 31 D-80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90113590.5 | 16.07.1990 | [1991/03] | Priority number, date | YU19890001423 | 14.07.1989 Original published format: YU 142389 | [1991/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0408083 | Date: | 16.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0408083 | Date: | 07.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F04B43/10, F04B15/04, F04B9/12, F01L25/06 | [1991/03] | CPC: |
F04B9/135 (EP);
F01L25/063 (EP);
F04B15/04 (EP);
F04B43/1136 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LU, NL [1991/03] | Title | German: | Dosierungsmembranpumpe für aggressive Flüssigkeiten | [1991/03] | English: | Aggressive liquids dosage membrane pump | [1991/03] | French: | Pompe de dosage à membrane pour liquides agressifs | [1991/03] | Examination procedure | 16.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/37] | 16.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/22] | Request for further processing for: | 03.02.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 03.02.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.03.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1992 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   01.02.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 07.06.1995 | DK | 07.06.1995 | ES | 07.06.1995 | FR | 07.06.1995 | GR | 07.06.1995 | IT | 07.06.1995 | NL | 07.06.1995 | LU | 31.07.1995 | [2004/35] |
Former [2002/24] | BE | 07.06.1995 | |
DK | 07.06.1995 | ||
ES | 07.06.1995 | ||
GR | 07.06.1995 | ||
IT | 07.06.1995 | ||
NL | 07.06.1995 | ||
LU | 31.07.1995 | ||
FR | 03.11.1995 | ||
Former [2000/04] | BE | 07.06.1995 | |
DK | 07.06.1995 | ||
GR | 07.06.1995 | ||
IT | 07.06.1995 | ||
NL | 07.06.1995 | ||
LU | 31.07.1995 | ||
FR | 03.11.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 07.06.1995 | |
DK | 07.06.1995 | ||
IT | 07.06.1995 | ||
NL | 07.06.1995 | ||
FR | 03.11.1995 | ||
Former [1998/15] | BE | 07.06.1995 | |
DK | 07.06.1995 | ||
NL | 07.06.1995 | ||
FR | 03.11.1995 | ||
Former [1996/18] | BE | 07.06.1995 | |
NL | 07.06.1995 | ||
FR | 03.11.1995 | ||
Former [1996/06] | BE | 07.06.1995 | |
NL | 07.06.1995 | ||
Former [1995/52] | NL | 07.06.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | US1920014 [ ]; | EP0315264 [ ]; | FR2284782 [ ]; | WO8404363 [ ]; | US3282167 [ ] | [A] - ENGINEERING, (INCL. MACHINE SHOP MAGAZINE) vol. 223, no. 12, December 1983, LONDON, GB, page 994, "Novel PTFE process pump handels aggressive chemicals." |