EP0419785 - Polystyrene concrete for precast concrete units [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.1998 [1998/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kesting, Klaus Lorenz, Dr.-Ing. Neuer Graben 3 44139 Dortmund / DE | [1996/41] |
Former [1991/14] | For all designated states Kesting, Lorenz Holzheck 21 D-44339 Dortmund / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kesting, Lorenz (verstorben) / DE | [1996/38] |
Former [1991/14] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Herrmann-Trentepohl, Werner, et al Patentanwälte Herrmann-Trentepohl Grosse, Bockhorni & Partner Massenbergstrasse 19-21 44787 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | Herrmann-Trentepohl, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Schaeferstrasse 18 D-44623 Herne / DE | ||
Former [1991/14] | Herrmann-Trentepohl, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Schaeferstrasse 18 D-44623 Herne / DE | Application number, filing date | 90113756.2 | 18.07.1990 | [1991/14] | Priority number, date | DE19893926123 | 08.08.1989 Original published format: DE 3926123 | DE19904003961 | 09.02.1990 Original published format: DE 4003961 | DE19893933615 | 07.10.1989 Original published format: DE 3933615 | [1991/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0419785 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0419785 | Date: | 27.12.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C04B28/02 | [1991/14] | CPC: |
E04C1/40 (EP);
C04B28/02 (EP);
E04C2/049 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/02, C04B14/06, C04B16/06, C04B16/08, C04B38/08, C04B38/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, NL [1991/17] |
Former [1991/14] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Polystyrolbeton für Betonfertigteile | [1991/14] | English: | Polystyrene concrete for precast concrete units | [1991/14] | French: | Béton renfermant du polystyrène pour pièces préfabriquées en béton | [1991/14] | Examination procedure | 19.08.1990 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LU | 17.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/46] | 16.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.08.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 09.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.02.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/34] | 09.03.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1998/34] | Request for further processing for: | 05.09.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 05.09.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.12.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.09.1990 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.09.1990 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.09.1990 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 25.09.1990 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.09.1990 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 25.09.1990 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.09.1990 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 25.09.1990 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.09.1990 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.09.1990 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.09.1990 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1997 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1089442 ; | [X]BE823361 ; | [A]GB1219948 ; | [AD]DE2351469 ; | [AD]DE2907630 |