blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0410306

EP0410306 - Process and apparatus for the sterilisation of waste, especially hospital waste [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.11.1995
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip11.11.1995No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.01.1996 [1996/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NORDPUNKT AG
CH-6986 Novaggio/TI / CH
[1991/05]
Inventor(s)01 / Maihofer, Willi
Schulstrasse 11
D-7460 Balingen/Weilstetten / DE
[1991/05]
Representative(s)SSM Sandmair
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt
Partnerschaft mbB
Joseph-Wild-Straße 20
81829 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1991/05]Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx
Stuntzstrasse 16
D-81677 München / DE
Application number, filing date90113871.919.07.1990
[1991/05]
Priority number, dateDE1989392474426.07.1989         Original published format: DE 3924744
[1991/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0410306
Date:30.01.1991
Language:DE
[1991/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0410306
Date:25.03.1992
Language:DE
[1992/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0410306
Date:11.01.1995
Language:DE
[1995/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.02.1992
ClassificationIPC:A61L11/00, A61L2/12
[1991/05]
CPC:
A61L11/00 (EP,US); A61L2/06 (EP,US); A61L2/12 (EP,US);
A61L2/18 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1991/05]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Sterilisation von Müll, insbesondere Krankenhausmüll[1991/05]
English:Process and apparatus for the sterilisation of waste, especially hospital waste[1991/05]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour la stérilisation de déchets, notamment de déchets d'hôpitaux[1991/05]
Examination procedure02.09.1992Examination requested  [1992/45]
17.05.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.07.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.10.1994Fee for grant paid
04.10.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.10.1995No opposition filed within time limit [1996/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
29.06.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AD]DE2908086  (GOELDNER HELMUT);
 [AD]DE3317300  (VIEREGGE BRUHNS GUENTHER [DE]);
 [E]WO9012601  (PILEMA S R L [IT]);
 [A]DE3505570  (GVB SANIMED HYGIENE UND MEDIZI)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.