EP0415068 - Process and apparatus for welding tubular thermoplastic elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.1997 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.03.1997 [1997/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEORG FISCHER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Mühlentalstrasse 105 CH-8201 Schaffhausen / CH | [1991/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kunz, Peter Breitenaustrasse 156 CH-8200 Schaffhausen / CH | [1991/10] | Application number, filing date | 90114030.1 | 21.07.1990 | [1991/10] | Priority number, date | CH19890003159 | 31.08.1989 Original published format: CH 315989 | [1991/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0415068 | Date: | 06.03.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0415068 | Date: | 21.10.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0415068 | Date: | 20.03.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B29C65/14, // B29L23/22 | [1992/43] | CPC: |
B29C66/1142 (EP);
B29C65/1412 (EP);
B29C65/1432 (EP);
B29C65/1445 (EP);
B29C65/1464 (EP);
B29C65/1467 (EP);
B29C66/324 (EP);
B29C66/3242 (EP);
B29C66/3472 (EP);
B29C66/5221 (EP);
B29C66/5229 (EP);
B29C66/612 (EP);
B29C66/634 (EP);
B29C66/652 (EP);
B29C66/73921 (EP);
B29C66/8122 (EP);
B29C66/81267 (EP);
B29C2035/0822 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/8122, B29K2909/08 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1991/10] | B29C65/14, // B29L23:22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1991/10] | Title | German: | Einrichtung und Verfahren zum Verschweissen rohrförmiger Teile aus thermoplastischem Material | [1991/10] | English: | Process and apparatus for welding tubular thermoplastic elements | [1991/10] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour le soudage d'éléments tubulaires en matière thermoplastique | [1991/10] | Examination procedure | 21.07.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 28.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP59098817 ; | [A]JP60060497 ; | [AP]JP1288422 ; | [A]JP62027126 ; | [A]BE629609 ; | [A]FR1476398 (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO); | [Y]FR2062913 (ROEVER MARTIN, et al); | [Y]CH540450 (MAEGERLE KARL [CH]); | [A]US4156626 (SOUDER JAMES J [US]); | [Y]DE3023838 (HILTI AG [LI]); | [A]US4419169 (BECKER LAWRENCE F [US], et al); | [Y]EP0304572 (FISCHER AG GEORG [CH]); | [A]EP0313731 (FISCHER AG GEORG [CH]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 210 (M-328)(1647) 26. September 1984 & JP-A-59 098 817 ( UBE KOSAN KK ) 7. Juni 1984, & JP59098817 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 194 (M-403)(1917) 10. August 1985 & JP-A-60 060 497 ( HITACHI SEISAKUSHO KK ) 8. April 1985, & JP60060497 A 00000000 | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 69 (M-932)(4012) 8. Februar 1990 & JP-A-1 288 422 ( KURARAY CO LTD ) 20. November 1989, & JP1288422 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 152 (M-695)(2999) 11. Mai 1988 & JP-A-62 027 126 ( TAKAO YOSHIDA ) 26. November 1987, & JP62027126 A 00000000 |