EP0410399 - Video preamplifier circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.08.1997 [1997/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066 Los Angeles, California 90045-0066 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066 Los Angeles, California 90045-0066 / US | ||
Former [1991/05] | For all designated states HUGHES AIRCRAFT COMPANY P.O. Box 80028 Los Angeles, CA 90080-0028 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ho, Kesse 13461 Pepperdine Circle Westminster, CA 92683 / US | 02 /
Ferguson, Bruce R. 13662 "A" Redhill Avenue Tustin, CA 92620 / US | 03 /
Sandoval, Gregory J. 1452 Red Bark Road Escondido California 92029 / US | [1991/05] | Representative(s) | Witte, Alexander Witte, Weller, Gahlert, Otten & Steil, Patentanwälte, Rotebühlstrasse 121 70178 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/14] | Witte, Alexander, Dr.-Ing. Witte, Weller, Gahlert & Otten Patentanwälte Rotebühlstrasse 121 D-70178 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1992/14] | Witte, Alexander, Dr.-Ing. Witte, Weller, Gahlert & Otten Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 14 W-7000 Stuttgart 1 / DE | ||
Former [1991/05] | Witte, Alexander, Dr.-Ing. Augustenstrasse 7 D-7000 Stuttgart 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 90114205.9 | 25.07.1990 | [1991/05] | Priority number, date | US19890386384 | 26.07.1989 Original published format: US 386384 | [1991/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0410399 | Date: | 30.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0410399 | Date: | 06.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0410399 | Date: | 28.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/14, H04N7/10, H04B3/14, H04N5/44 | [1992/19] | CPC: |
H04N7/102 (EP,US);
H03F3/72 (EP,US);
H04N5/148 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/05] | H04N5/44 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1991/05] | Title | German: | Videovorverstärkerschaltung | [1991/05] | English: | Video preamplifier circuit | [1991/05] | French: | Circuit pré-amplificateur vidéo | [1991/05] | Examination procedure | 28.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/52] | 25.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 24.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2302632 (STEM ELECTRONIQUE [FR]); | [Y]US4148069 (SMILEY CHARLES F, et al); | [A]GB2021360 (DATA 100 CORP); | [Y]EP0084628 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) | [A] - ELECTRONIQUE INDUSTRIELLE no. 144, 15 May 1988, PARIS,FRANCE pages 33 - 38; ROBERT LAHAYE: 'Applications des amplificateurs de commutation vidéo' |