EP0413176 - Metal plate stator case, particularly for radial centrifugal pumps [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.1997 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahicho Ohta-ku Tokyo 144 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/51] | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahicho Ohta-ku Tokyo 144 / JP | ||
Former [1991/08] | For all designated states Carretta, Tiziano Via Fogazzaro 29 I-36040 Grumolo delle Abbadesse (Vicenza) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carretta, Tiziano Via Fogazzaro 29 I-36040 Grumolo delle Abbadesse VI / IT | [1996/09] |
Former [1991/08] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Forattini, Amelia, et al Internazionale Brevetti Ingg. ZINI, MARANESI & C. S.r.l. Piazza Castello 1 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1991/08] | Forattini, Amelia, et al c/o Internazionale Brevetti Ingg. ZINI, MARANESI & C. S.r.l. Piazza Castello 1 I-20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 90114318.0 | 26.07.1990 | [1991/08] | Priority number, date | IT19890085635 | 18.08.1989 Original published format: IT 8563589 | [1991/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0413176 | Date: | 20.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0413176 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0413176 | Date: | 28.02.1996 | [1996/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/42 | [1991/08] | CPC: |
F04D29/445 (EP,US);
F04D29/4266 (EP,US);
Y10S416/03 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/08] | Title | German: | Blechgehäuse, insbesondere für Radialkreiselpumpen | [1991/08] | English: | Metal plate stator case, particularly for radial centrifugal pumps | [1991/08] | French: | Corps en tôle, notamment pour pompes centrifuges à roue radiale | [1991/08] | Examination procedure | 03.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/33] | 22.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 04.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/08] | Request for further processing for: | 13.12.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 04.11.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.01.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.02.1996 | BE | 28.02.1996 | CH | 28.02.1996 | FR | 28.02.1996 | GR | 28.02.1996 | LI | 28.02.1996 | NL | 28.02.1996 | SE | 31.05.1996 | GB | 26.07.1996 | LU | 31.07.1996 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/07] | AT | 28.02.1996 | |
BE | 28.02.1996 | ||
CH | 28.02.1996 | ||
GR | 28.02.1996 | ||
LI | 28.02.1996 | ||
NL | 28.02.1996 | ||
SE | 31.05.1996 | ||
FR | 26.07.1996 | ||
GB | 26.07.1996 | ||
LU | 31.07.1996 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 28.02.1996 | |
BE | 28.02.1996 | ||
CH | 28.02.1996 | ||
GR | 28.02.1996 | ||
LI | 28.02.1996 | ||
SE | 31.05.1996 | ||
FR | 26.07.1996 | ||
GB | 26.07.1996 | ||
LU | 31.07.1996 | ||
Former [1997/30] | AT | 28.02.1996 | |
BE | 28.02.1996 | ||
CH | 28.02.1996 | ||
LI | 28.02.1996 | ||
SE | 31.05.1996 | ||
FR | 26.07.1996 | ||
GB | 26.07.1996 | ||
Former [1997/13] | AT | 28.02.1996 | |
BE | 28.02.1996 | ||
CH | 28.02.1996 | ||
LI | 28.02.1996 | ||
SE | 31.05.1996 | ||
FR | 26.07.1996 | ||
Former [1997/06] | AT | 28.02.1996 | |
BE | 28.02.1996 | ||
SE | 31.05.1996 | ||
FR | 26.07.1996 | ||
Former [1996/52] | AT | 28.02.1996 | |
BE | 28.02.1996 | ||
SE | 31.05.1996 | ||
Former [1996/42] | AT | 28.02.1996 | |
SE | 31.05.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1021668 (AJEM LAB INC); | [X]GB1237961 ; | [X]DE2047501 (PHILIPP HILGE FA); | [Y]GB2172659 (AUSTIN ROVER GROUP); | [Y]DE3517828 (KLEIN SCHANZLIN & BECKER AG [DE]) |