EP0412362 - Optical recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.04.1993 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.06.1993 [1993/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/07] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iselborn, Stefan, Dr. Friedrichstrasse 164 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
Hibst, Hartmut, Dr. Sternstrasse 215 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
Kuppelmaier, Harald, Dr. In den Bannzaeunen 17 D-6701 Goennheim / DE | [1991/07] | Application number, filing date | 90114332.1 | 26.07.1990 | [1991/07] | Priority number, date | DE19893926060 | 07.08.1989 Original published format: DE 3926060 | [1991/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0412362 | Date: | 13.02.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0412362 | Date: | 22.04.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/24, G11B7/00 | [1991/07] | CPC: |
G11B7/24 (EP);
G11B7/243 (EP);
G11B2007/24312 (EP);
G11B2007/24316 (EP);
G11B7/2534 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1991/07] | Title | German: | Optisches Aufzeichnungsmedium | [1991/07] | English: | Optical recording medium | [1991/07] | French: | Support d'enregistrement optique | [1991/07] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 27.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 22.04.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR2420188 | [X] - JOURNAL OF THE PHYSICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN Bd. 56, Nr. 1, Januar 1987, Seiten 158 - 162; FUKUMOTO ET AL: 'Structural Changes of Amorphous GeTe2 Films by Annealing' | [XD] - JOURNAL OF THE PHYSICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN Bd. 56, Nr. 9, September 1987, Seiten 3396 - 3397; TSUNETOMO ET AL: 'Effects of Film Thickness and Substrate-Film Interface on the Formation of Metastable Crystalline GeTe2 from Amorphous GeTe2 Film' | [AD] - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS Bd. 49, Nr. 9, 1. September 1986, Seiten 502 - 504; CHEN ET AL: 'Compound materials for reversible, phase-change optical data storage' |