EP0410444 - Ohmic contact electrodes for semiconductor diamonds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/05] | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishii, Masayuki, c/o Itami Works Sumitomo Electric Ind. Ltd., 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP | 02 /
Kimoto, Tunenobu, c/o Itami Works Sumitomo Electric Ind. Ltd., 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP | 03 /
Nakagama, Shoji, c/o Itami Works Sumitomo Electric Ind. Ltd., 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP | 04 /
Tomikawa, Tadashi, c/o Itami Works Sumitomo Electric Ind. Ltd., 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP | 05 /
Fujita, Nobuhiko, c/o Itami Works Sumitomo Electric Ind. Ltd., 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP | [1991/05] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/05] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90114352.9 | 26.07.1990 | [1991/05] | Priority number, date | JP19890193607 | 26.07.1989 Original published format: JP 19360789 | [1991/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0410444 | Date: | 30.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0410444 | Date: | 11.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0410444 | Date: | 01.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/28, H01L29/16 | [1992/11] | CPC: |
H01L21/043 (EP,US);
H01L29/45 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/05] | H01L21/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/05] | Title | German: | Elektrode mit ohmschem Kontakt für Halbleiterdiamanten | [1991/05] | English: | Ohmic contact electrodes for semiconductor diamonds | [1991/05] | French: | Electrodes contact ohmique pour diamants semi-conducteur | [1991/05] | Examination procedure | 20.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 27.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - IEEE ELECTRON DEVICE LETTERS. vol. 9, no. 7, July 1988, NEW YORK US pages 350 - 351; K.L.MOAZED: 'Ohmic Contact to Semiconducting Diamond' | [AP] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRON DEVICES. vol. 36, no. 9, September 1989, NEW YORK US pages 1783 - 1786; F.FANG ET AL.: 'Ohmic Contacts Formed by Ion Mixing in the Si-Diamond System' |