EP0410455 - Fluid-filled cylindrical elastic mount having annular fluid chamber with constant cross sectional area over the entire circumference [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.1996 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.01.1996 [1996/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOKAI RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD. 3600, Aza-Utazu Oaza-Kitatoyama Komaki-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/05] | For all designated states TOKAI RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD. 3600, Aza-Utazu Oaza-Kitatoyama Komaki-shi Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanahasi, Hiroaki, c/o Tokai Rubber Ind. Ltd. 3600, Aza-Utazu, Oaza-Kitatoyama Komaki-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [1991/05] | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/05] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90114378.4 | 26.07.1990 | [1991/05] | Priority number, date | JP19890088167U | 27.07.1989 Original published format: JP 8816789 U | [1991/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0410455 | Date: | 30.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0410455 | Date: | 01.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F16F13/00 | [1991/05] | CPC: |
F16F13/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/05] | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitsgefülltes, zylindrisch-elastisches Lager mit ringförmiger Flüssigkeitskammer gleicher Querschnittsfläche | [1991/05] | English: | Fluid-filled cylindrical elastic mount having annular fluid chamber with constant cross sectional area over the entire circumference | [1991/05] | French: | Support cylindrique élastique rempli de fluide présentant une chambre annulaire de fluide ayant une section droite de superficie constante tout au long de sa circonférence | [1995/05] |
Former [1991/05] | Manchonnage élastique à remplissage de fluide avec des chambres de fluide annulaires avec superficie pareil | Examination procedure | 31.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 26.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4786036 ; | [A]DE3831284 | Examination | EP0385416 | JPH05216554 | JPH04836151 |