EP0412370 - ABS mouldings with improved tensile stress [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 21.06.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.1996 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 07.08.1996 [1996/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/07] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eichenauer, Herbert, Dr. Gustav-Heinemann-Strasse 3 D-4047 Dormagen / DE | 02 /
Pischtschan, Alfred, Dr. Zur Eiche 33 D-5967 Kürten / DE | 03 /
Ott, Karl-Heinz, Dr. Paul-Klee-Strasse 54 D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | [1991/07] | Application number, filing date | 90114412.1 | 27.07.1990 | [1991/07] | Priority number, date | DE19893926275 | 09.08.1989 Original published format: DE 3926275 | [1991/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0412370 | Date: | 13.02.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0412370 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/52] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0412370 | Date: | 07.08.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08L101/00, C08L51/04, C08L23/16 | [1991/07] | CPC: |
C08L51/04 (EP,US);
C08L25/12 (EP,US);
C08L23/16 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L25/12, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L51/04, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L51/04, C08L2666/04 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1991/07] | Title | German: | ABS-Formmassen mit verbesserter Streckspannung | [1991/07] | English: | ABS mouldings with improved tensile stress | [1991/07] | French: | Masses à mouler à partir d'ABS avec une contrainte de traction modifiée | [1991/07] | Examination procedure | 27.07.1990 | Examination requested [1991/07] | 25.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
27.09.1994
02.11.1994
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.09.1994
02.11.1994
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Ludwigshafen -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 25.11.1994 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.12.1994 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 03.01.1995 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 06.03.1995 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 24.10.1995 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.11.1995 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.11.1995 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 01.12.1995 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 06.03.1996 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 12.04.1996 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2141432 (MITSUBISHI MONSANTO CHEM) |