EP0413190 - Polycarbonates prepared from n-alkyl substituted cyclohexylidene diphenols [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.05.1992 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.1992 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.07.1992 [1992/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/08] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Serini, Volker, Dr. Sebastian-Kneipp-Weg 2 D-4150 Krefeld / DE | 02 /
Freitag, Dieter, Dr. Hasenheide 10 D-4150 Krefeld 1 / DE | 03 /
Westeppe, Uwe, Dr. Vogelskamp 72 D-4020 Mettmann / DE | 04 /
Idel, Karsten-Josef, Dr. Am Schwarzkamp 38 D-4150 Krefeld / DE | 05 /
Grigo, Ulrich, Dr. Michelsheide 9 D-4152 Kempen 3 / DE | [1991/08] | Application number, filing date | 90114638.1 | 31.07.1990 | [1991/08] | Priority number, date | DE19893926768 | 12.08.1989 Original published format: DE 3926768 | [1991/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0413190 | Date: | 20.02.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0413190 | Date: | 17.04.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08G64/06, C08L69/00, C08K3/00, C08K5/00, C07C39/17 | [1991/14] | CPC: |
C08L69/00 (EP);
C08G64/06 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1991/08] | C08G64/06, C08L69/00, C08K3/00, C08K5/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/08] | Title | German: | Polycarbonate aus n-Alkyl-substituierten Cyclohexylidenbisphenolen | [1991/08] | English: | Polycarbonates prepared from n-alkyl substituted cyclohexylidene diphenols | [1991/08] | French: | Polycarbonates à partir de biphénols cyclohexylidéniques n-alkyl substitués | [1991/08] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 31.07.1990 | Examination requested [1991/08] | 07.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]JP6162040 ; | [XD]JP61105550 ; | [XD]JP6162039 ; | [X]US4368315 ; | [A]DE3345945 ; | [AP]EP0374656 ; | [AP]EP0374623 | [XD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 225 (P-484)(2281) 6 August 1986, & JP-A-61 62040 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) 29 März 1986,, & JP6162040 A 19860806 | [XD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 284 (P-501)(2340) 26 September 1986, & JP-A-61 105550 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) 23 Mai 1986,, & JP61105550 A 19860926 | [XD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 225 (P-484)(2281) 6 August 1986, & JP-A-61 62039 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) 29 März 1986,, & JP6162039 A 19860806 | [AD] - SCHNELL,H.: "CHEMISTRY AND PHYSICS OF POLYCARBONATES" 1964, INTERSCIENCE PUBLISHERS, NEW YORK |