EP0416293 - Suspension and locking for a bunk in a driver's cab [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.09.1994 [1994/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Nutzfahrzeuge Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 50 06 20 80976 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | For all designated states MAN Nutzfahrzeuge Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 50 06 20 D-80976 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Watzek, Gerhard Eduard-Spranger-Strasse 34 D-8000 München 45 / DE | 02 /
Knecht, Stefan Flotowstrasse 24 D-8000 München 21 / DE | [1991/11] | Application number, filing date | 90114929.4 | 03.08.1990 | [1991/11] | Priority number, date | DE19893929784 | 07.09.1989 Original published format: DE 3929784 | [1991/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0416293 | Date: | 13.03.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0416293 | Date: | 22.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B62D33/06, B60P3/38 | [1991/11] | CPC: |
B62D33/0612 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, NL, SE [1991/11] | Title | German: | Fahrerhaus-Schlafliege-Aufhängung und Verriegelung | [1991/11] | English: | Suspension and locking for a bunk in a driver's cab | [1991/11] | French: | Suspension et verrouillage d'une couchette pour cabine de camion | [1991/11] | Examination procedure | 04.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/22] | 07.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2640895 ; | [A]EP0300322 (IVECO MAGIRUS [DE]); | [A]EP0218902 (MAN NUTZFAHRZEUGE GMBH [DE]) |