EP0419818 - Edge card connector having preloaded contacts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.01.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.03.1995 [1995/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBINSON NUGENT, INC. 800 East Eighth Street New Albany Indiana 47150-1208 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/14] | For all designated states ROBINSON NUGENT, INC. 800 East Eighth Street New Albany, Indiana 47150-1208 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tondreault, Robert J. 4014 Waterford Circle 3 Louisville, Kentucky 40207 / US | [1991/14] | Representative(s) | Leiser, Gottfried, et al Prinz & Partner GbR Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/14] | Leiser, Gottfried, Dipl.-Ing., et al Prinz & Partner, Manzingerweg 7 D-81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90115156.3 | 07.08.1990 | [1991/14] | Priority number, date | US19890411796 | 25.09.1989 Original published format: US 411796 | [1991/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0419818 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01R9/09, H01R23/70 | [1991/14] | CPC: |
H01R12/721 (EP,US);
H01R12/82 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/14] | Title | German: | Mit der Plattenkante zusammenwirkender Verbinder mit vorgespannten Anschlusskontakten | [1991/14] | English: | Edge card connector having preloaded contacts | [1991/14] | French: | Connecteur coopérant avec la bordure d'une carte à contacts précontraints | [1991/14] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 01.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/48] | 22.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/10] | 10.10.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1994 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1222168 (CONTINENTAL CONNECTOR CORP); | [AD]US3530422 (GOODMAN DAVID S); | [AD]US3671917 (AMMON JOHN P, et al); | [AD]US3737838 (MATTINGLY W, et al); | [XP]EP0367373 (AMP INC [US]) |