EP0470285 - Cutting tool for the machining of internal and external shapes on workpieces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.1995 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.02.1995 [1995/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAPAL Fabrik für Präzisionswerkzeuge Dr. Kress KG Obere Bahnstrasse 13 D-73431 Aalen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/16] | For all designated states MAPAL Fabrik für Präzisionswerkzeuge Dr. Kress KG Obere Bahnstrasse 13 D-73431 Aalen / DE | ||
Former [1992/14] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1992/07] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GmbH Wernerstrasse 1 D-70469 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fees, Heiner, Dipl.-Ing. (BA) Pforzheimer Strasse 38 D-7120 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | 02 /
Goetz, Manfred Frankenstrasse 12 D-8540 Schwabach / DE | [1992/07] | Representative(s) | Gleiss, Alf-Olav, et al Gleiss Grosse Schrell und Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstrasse 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/13] | Gleiss, Alf-Olav, Dr.jur. Dipl.-Ing., et al Gleiss & Grosse Patentanwaltskanzlei Maybachstrasse 6A D-70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 90115305.6 | 09.08.1990 | [1992/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0470285 | Date: | 12.02.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0470285 | Date: | 02.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B23B29/24, B23B51/08 | [1992/07] | CPC: |
B23C5/2472 (EP);
B23B29/248 (EP);
B23C5/2226 (EP);
B23C5/24 (EP);
B23C5/2462 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1992/07] | Title | German: | Schneidewerkzeug für die Bearbeitung von Innen- und Aussenkonturen an Werkstücken | [1992/07] | English: | Cutting tool for the machining of internal and external shapes on workpieces | [1992/07] | French: | Outil de coupe pour l'usinage de contours internes et externes sur des pièces | [1992/07] | Examination procedure | 11.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/41] | 28.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE8321950U ; | [A]DE3502346 (GUEHRING GOTTLIEB FA [DE]); | [A]CH452320 (SANDVIKENS JERNVERKS AB [SE]); | [A]FR2509642 (KOMET STAHLHALTER WERKZEUG [DE]); | [A]EP0028705 (COROMANT ENG GMBH [DE]) |