EP0413260 - Surface treatment chemicals for forming hydrophilic coatings, treatment bath containing them, and treatment method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.02.1995 [1995/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Paint Co., Ltd. 2-1-2, Oyodokita Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/08] | For all designated states NIPPON PAINT CO., LTD. 2-1-2, Oyodokita Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meguro, Shigeyuki 17-25, Utsukushigaoka 4-chome Midori-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Yasuhara, Kiyotada 3, Susukino 2-chome, Midori-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1991/08] | Representative(s) | Brauns, Hans-Adolf, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/08] | Brauns, Hans-Adolf, Dr. rer. nat., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90115311.4 | 09.08.1990 | [1991/08] | Priority number, date | JP19890208620 | 11.08.1989 Original published format: JP 20862089 | [1991/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0413260 | Date: | 20.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0413260 | Date: | 19.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0413260 | Date: | 16.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C09D129/04, B05D7/16, C23C26/00, // C09D177/00 ,(C09D129/04, 177:00, 161:28) | [1994/07] | CPC: |
C09D177/00 (EP,US);
C09D129/04 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C09D129/04, C08L2666/14 (US,EP);
C09D177/00, C08L2666/02 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [1991/08] | C09D129/04, B05D7/16, C23C26/00, // (C09D129/04, 177:00, 161:28) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/08] | Title | German: | Oberflächenbehandlungschemikalien zur Bildung hydrophiler Beschichtungen, diese enthaltendes Behandlungsbad und Behandlungsverfahren | [1991/08] | English: | Surface treatment chemicals for forming hydrophilic coatings, treatment bath containing them, and treatment method | [1991/08] | French: | Produits chimiques de traitement de surfaces pour la formation des revêtements hydrophiliques, bain de traitement les contenant et méthode de traitement | [1991/08] | Examination procedure | 06.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/08] | 08.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]JP01299877 ; | [A]JP62176578 ; | [A]JP61228031 | [XP] - DATABASE WPIL, accession no. 90-019564 (03), Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; & JP-A-01 299 877 (KANSAI PAINT KK) 4th December 1989, & JP01299877 A 00000000 | [A] - DATABASE WPIL, accession no. 87-254442 (36), Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; & JP-A-62 176 578 (NIPPON PAINT CO. LTD) 3rd August 1987, & JP62176578 A 00000000 | [A] - DATABASE WPIL, accession no. 86-308852 (47), Derwent Publications LTD., London, GB; & JP-A-61 228 031 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEM KK) 11th October 1986, & JP61228031 A 00000000 | Examination | JP1299877 | - Database Wpil, accession no.90-019564 (03), Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; &JP-A-1299877 (Kansai Paint KK) 4.Dec.1989, & JP1299877 A 00000000 |