EP0442031 - Brake for a hydraulic motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.02.1994 [1994/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KINSHOFER GREIFTECHNIK GMBH Hauptstrasse 76 D-63666 Waakirchen / DE | [1991/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spindeldreher, Walter Schwamhammer Strasse 4 D-8167 Irschenberg / DE | [1991/34] | Representative(s) | Gossel, Hans K., et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/45] | Gossel, Hans K., Dipl.-Ing., et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/34] | Gossel, Hans K., Dipl.-Ing. Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90115408.8 | 10.08.1990 | [1991/34] | Priority number, date | DE19904004411 | 13.02.1990 Original published format: DE 4004411 | DE19904008362 | 15.03.1990 Original published format: DE 4008362 | [1991/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0442031 | Date: | 21.08.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0442031 | Date: | 24.02.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F04C15/00 | [1991/34] | CPC: |
F04C15/0084 (EP,US);
F04C15/0061 (EP,US);
F16D55/40 (EP,US);
F16D59/02 (EP,US);
F16D2055/0058 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/34] | Title | German: | Bremse für einen Hydromotor | [1993/08] | English: | Brake for a hydraulic motor | [1991/34] | French: | Frein pour moteur hydraulique | [1991/34] |
Former [1991/34] | Bremse, vorzugsweise Bremse für einen Hydromotor | Examination procedure | 11.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/46] | 25.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.06.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3960470 (KINDER MARK RUSSELL); | [A]DE3125087 (DANFOSS AS [DK]); | [A]DE1503362 (VELTRUP WERKE KG) |