EP0414107 - Liquefaction of natural gas using process-loaded expanders [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.12.1993 [1993/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC. 7201 Hamilton Boulevard Allentown, PA 18195-1501 / US | [1991/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herron, Donn Michael 23 Peach Lane Fogelsville, PA 18051 / US | 02 /
Chatterjee, Nirmal 3537 Pleasant Avenue Allentown, PA 18103 / US | [1991/09] | Representative(s) | Marx, Lothar, et al Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Postfach 86 02 45 81629 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/09] | Marx, Lothar, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 D-81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90115587.9 | 14.08.1990 | [1991/09] | Priority number, date | US19890396577 | 21.08.1989 Original published format: US 396577 | [1991/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0414107 | Date: | 27.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0414107 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0414107 | Date: | 30.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F25J3/06 | [1991/09] | CPC: |
F25J1/0022 (EP,US);
F25J3/00 (KR);
F25J1/0042 (EP,US);
F25J1/0055 (EP,US);
F25J1/0057 (EP,US);
F25J1/0216 (EP,US);
F25J1/0231 (EP,US);
F25J1/0288 (EP,US);
F25J1/0291 (EP,US);
F25J1/0292 (EP,US);
F25J2210/02 (EP,US);
F25J2220/64 (EP,US);
F25J2230/08 (EP,US);
F25J2230/20 (EP,US);
F25J2230/60 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1991/09] | Title | German: | Erdgasverflüssigung mit Hilfe einer prozessbelasteten Expansionsmaschine | [1991/09] | English: | Liquefaction of natural gas using process-loaded expanders | [1991/09] | French: | Liquéfaction de gaz naturel à l'aide d'une machine à expansion accouplée au procédé | [1991/09] | Examination procedure | 28.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 10.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3763658 (GAUMER L, et al); | [AD]US4065278 (NEWTON CHARLES L, et al); | [AD]US4334902 (PARADOWSKI HENRI) |