EP0413352 - Solvent based coating composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.12.1995 [1995/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Paint Co., Ltd. 1-2, Oyodo-kita 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/29] | For all designated states Nippon Paint Co., Ltd. 1-2, Oyodo-kita 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | ||
Former [1991/08] | For all designated states Nippon Paint Co., Ltd. 2-1-2, Oyodokita Oyodo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Urano, Satoshi 2-6-14, Kasumisaka., Tanabe-cho Tsuzukigun, Kyoto / JP | 02 /
Tsuboniwa, Noriyuki 2-26-21, Arakawa, Higashiosaka-shi Osaka / JP | 03 /
Aoki, Kei 1-16-7, Shikanosainishi Ikoma-shi, Nara / JP | 04 /
Umemoto, Hirotoshi 138-97, Oneo, Hirono-cho Uji-shi, Kyoto / JP | [1994/52] |
Former [1992/14] | 01 /
Urano, satoshi 2-6-14, Kasumisaka., Tanabe-cho Tsuzukigun, Kyoto / JP | ||
02 /
Tsuboniwa, Noriyuki 2-26-21, Arakawa, Higashiosaka-shi Osaka / JP | |||
03 /
Aoki, Kei 1-16-7, Shikanosainishi Ikoma-shi, Nara / JP | |||
04 /
Umemoto, Hirotoshi 138-97, Oneo, Hirono-cho Uji-shi, Kyoto / JP | |||
Former [1991/08] | 01 /
Urano, satoshi 2-6-14, Kasumisaka., Tanabe-cho Tsuzukigun, Kyoto / JP | ||
02 /
Tsubonwa, Noriyuki 2-26-21, Arakawa, Higashiosaka-shi Osaka / JP | |||
03 /
Aoki, Krei 1-16-7, Shikanosainishi Ikoma-shi, Nara / JP | |||
04 /
Umemoto, Hirotoshi 138-97, Oneo, Hirono-cho Uji-shi, Kyoto / JP | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/08] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90115803.0 | 17.08.1990 | [1991/08] | Priority number, date | JP19890213226 | 17.08.1989 Original published format: JP 21322689 | [1991/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0413352 | Date: | 20.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0413352 | Date: | 02.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0413352 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C09D157/04 | [1991/08] | CPC: |
C09D157/04 (EP,US);
C09D127/00 (KR);
C09D133/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/08] | Title | German: | Lösemittelhaltige Überzugszusammensetzung | [1991/08] | English: | Solvent based coating composition | [1991/08] | French: | Composition de revêtement à base de solvant | [1991/08] | Examination procedure | 07.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/23] | 22.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2197025 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0206544 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD [JP]); | [AD]EP0243160 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD [JP]) |