EP0415214 - Method for the production of derivatives of alpha-fluoroacrylic acid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.01.1995 [1995/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/10] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gassen, Karl-Rudolf, Dr. Auenweg 6a D-5068 Odenthal / DE | 02 /
Marhold, Albrecht, Dr. Carl-Duisberg-Strasse 329 D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | [1991/10] | Application number, filing date | 90115876.6 | 18.08.1990 | [1991/10] | Priority number, date | DE19893928990 | 01.09.1989 Original published format: DE 3928990 | [1991/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0415214 | Date: | 06.03.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0415214 | Date: | 26.02.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0415214 | Date: | 02.02.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07C67/317, C07C69/653, C07C231/12 | [1991/10] | CPC: |
C07C51/097 (EP,US);
C07C67/317 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C51/097, C07C53/21 (EP,US);
C07C67/317, C07C69/653 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von alpha-Fluoracrylsäurederivaten | [1991/10] | English: | Method for the production of derivatives of alpha-fluoroacrylic acid | [1991/10] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication de dérivés de l'acide alpha-fluoroacrylique | [1991/10] | Examination procedure | 20.08.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 08.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0132681 (BAYER AG [DE]) | [AD] - IZV. AKAD. NAUK SSSR Band 1982, Nr. 3, Seiten 654-657, 655, Zeilen 21-25; A.G. TALYBOV et al.: "Reaktion von Haloolefinen mit Nitroniumtetrafluoroborat" | [A] - JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY Band 76, Nr. 2, 1954, Seiten 479-481, 480, Spalte 2; A.L. HENNE et al.: "Ionization constants of fluorinated acids. III. Unsaturated acids" |