blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0438634

EP0438634 - Evaluation circuit for a capacitive sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.11.1996
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 02.01.2008  [2008/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VDO Adolf Schindling AG
Gräfstrasse 103
D-60487 Frankfurt / DE
[1991/31]
Inventor(s)01 / Wallrafen, Werner
Hauptstrasse 127B
D-6231 Sulzbach/Ts. / DE
[1991/31]
Representative(s)Klein, Thomas
Kruppstrasse 105
60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [1991/31]Klein, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. (FH)
Sodener Strasse 9
D-65824 Schwalbach/Ts. / DE
Application number, filing date90115980.621.08.1990
[1991/31]
Priority number, dateDE1990400181423.01.1990         Original published format: DE 4001814
[1991/31]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0438634
Date:31.07.1991
Language:DE
[1991/31]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0438634
Date:04.03.1992
Language:DE
[1992/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0438634
Date:17.01.1996
Language:DE
[1996/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.01.1992
ClassificationIPC:H03K17/955, B60S1/08, G01R27/26
[1992/10]
CPC:
H03K17/955 (EP,US); B60S1/0818 (EP,US); B60S1/0825 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1991/31]H03K17/955, B60S1/08
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1991/31]
TitleGerman:Auswerteschaltung für einen kapazitiven Sensor[1991/31]
English:Evaluation circuit for a capacitive sensor[1991/31]
French:Circuit d'évaluation pour capteur capacitif[1991/31]
Examination procedure27.01.1992Examination requested  [1992/13]
17.10.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.04.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.06.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.07.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.09.1995Fee for grant paid
01.09.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.10.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1997/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.07.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
05.07.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
04.07.1995Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT17.01.1996
SE17.04.1996
[2008/01]
Former [1999/42]IT17.01.1996
SE17.04.1996
Former [1996/38]SE17.04.1996
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0196912  (HONEYWELL INC [US]);
 [A]EP0088561  (HONEYWELL INC [US]);
 [A]US3774237  (HARDWAY E);
 [A]US4748400  (TYPPO PEKKA M [US]);
 [AD]EP0175362  (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.