EP0415287 - Procedure for removing cholesterol and cholesterol esters from egg-yolk [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/10] | Procedure for the preparation of cholesterol, for example cholesterol esters, from egg-yolk | ||
[1993/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.1994 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.10.1994 [1994/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SKW Trostberg Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 12 62, Dr.-Albert-Frank-Strasse 32 D-83308 Trostberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/10] | For all designated states SKW TROSTBERG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Postfach 12 62, Dr.-Albert-Frank-Strasse 32 D-83308 Trostberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cully, Jan, Dr. Nikolaistrasse 11 D-8200 Rosenheim / DE | 02 /
Vollbrecht, Heinz-Rüdiger, Dr. Gräfin-Adelheid-Strasse 8 D-8226 Altenmarkt / DE | 03 /
Wiesmüller, Johann Gartenstrasse 4 D-8261 Engelsberg / DE | [1991/10] | Representative(s) | Huber, Bernhard, et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/10] | Huber, Bernhard, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90116260.2 | 24.08.1990 | [1991/10] | Priority number, date | DE19893928258 | 26.08.1989 Original published format: DE 3928258 | [1991/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0415287 | Date: | 06.03.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0415287 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0415287 | Date: | 27.10.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/32, A23L1/015, C07J9/00 | [1991/40] | CPC: |
C07J9/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/10] | C07J9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Entfernung von Cholesterin bzw. Cholesterinestern aus Eigelb | [1991/10] | English: | Procedure for removing cholesterol and cholesterol esters from egg-yolk | [1993/43] | French: | Procédé pour éliminer le cholestérol et les esters de cholestérol du jaune d'oeuf | [1993/43] |
Former [1991/10] | Procedure for the preparation of cholesterol, for example cholesterol esters, from egg-yolk | ||
Former [1991/10] | Procédé pour préparer le cholestérol, par exemple les esters de cholestérol du jaune d'oeuf | Examination procedure | 27.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/04] | 01.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0326469 (MONSERBIO [FR]) |