EP0417529 - Chuck [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.1993 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.04.1993 [1993/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paul Forkardt GmbH & Co. KG Postfach 10 24 42 D-40015 Düsseldorf 1 / DE | [1991/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grund, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing- Ernst-Lemmer-Strasse 68 D-4000 Düsseldorf 13 / DE | 02 /
Kempken, Rainer Donaustrasse 3 D-4006 Erkrath / DE | [1991/12] | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/12] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 D-40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 90116297.4 | 25.08.1990 | [1991/12] | Priority number, date | DE19893930690 | 14.09.1989 Original published format: DE 3930690 | [1991/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0417529 | Date: | 20.03.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0417529 | Date: | 11.12.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B23B31/177 | [1991/12] | CPC: |
B23B31/16179 (EP,US);
Y10T279/1041 (EP,US);
Y10T279/1291 (EP,US);
Y10T279/1973 (EP,US);
Y10T279/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, FR, GB, IT [1991/12] | Title | German: | Spannfutter | [1991/12] | English: | Chuck | [1991/12] | French: | Mandrin | [1991/12] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 15.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/11] | 25.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3802982 (BERGER ZOLTAN [DE]); | [AD]DE2903904 ; | [AD]DE1301689 (FORKARDT PAUL KG) |