EP0415325 - Video signal processing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/10] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sokawa, Kenta 5-13-203, Makita-cho Takatsuki-Shi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Ishizu, Atsushi 15-1-905, Kitaoohi-cho Takatsuki-shi, Osaka / JP | 03 /
Imai, Kiyoshi 4-12 Futaba-cho Iberaki-shi, Osaka / JP | [1991/10] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/10] | Dipl.-Phys.Dr. Manitz Dipl.-Ing. Finsterwald Dipl.-Ing. Grämkow Dipl.Chem.Dr. Heyn Dipl.Phys. Rotermund Morgan, B.Sc.(Phys.) Postfach 22 16 11 D-80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90116396.4 | 27.08.1990 | [1991/10] | Priority number, date | JP19890227693 | 01.09.1989 Original published format: JP 22769389 | JP19890325050 | 14.12.1989 Original published format: JP 32505089 | [1991/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0415325 | Date: | 06.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0415325 | Date: | 22.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0415325 | Date: | 08.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/44, H04N5/14, H04N7/32 | [1995/45] | CPC: |
H04N5/144 (EP,US);
H04N7/01 (KR);
H04N7/012 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/17] | H04N5/44, H04N5/14, H04N7/137 | ||
Former IPC [1991/10] | H04N5/14, H04N7/137 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/10] | Title | German: | Videosignalverarbeitungsgerät | [1991/10] | English: | Video signal processing apparatus | [1991/10] | French: | Appareil de traitement de signal vidéo | [1991/10] | Examination procedure | 27.08.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 17.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4275418 (TRUMP MARTIN R, et al); | [A]EP0163513 (RCA CORP [US]); | [Y]GB2175770 (RCA CORP); | [A]EP0241854 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al); | [A]EP0318760 (BLAUPUNKT WERKE GMBH [DE]) |