EP0415396 - Liquid crystal color projection display apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD. 1-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/10] | For all designated states ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD. 1-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ooi, Yoshiharu 1-27-2, Nishigaoka, Izumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Gunjima, Tomoki 2-15-10, Shirane-cho, Asahi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1991/10] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/10] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90116596.9 | 29.08.1990 | [1991/10] | Priority number, date | JP19890223057 | 31.08.1989 Original published format: JP 22305789 | JP19890230422 | 07.09.1989 Original published format: JP 23042289 | [1991/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0415396 | Date: | 06.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0415396 | Date: | 07.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0415396 | Date: | 05.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/31 | [1991/10] | CPC: |
H04N9/3105 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/10] | Title | German: | Flüssigkristallfarbprojektionsanzeigevorrichtung | [1991/10] | English: | Liquid crystal color projection display apparatus | [1991/10] | French: | Appareil de visualisation de projection couleur à cristaux liquides | [1991/10] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 29.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 05.03.1997 | IT | 05.03.1997 | [2008/01] |
Former [1999/42] | BE | 05.03.1997 | |
IT | 05.03.1997 | ||
Former [1997/49] | BE | 05.03.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP63309917 ; | [A]JP63092192 ; | [X]EP0258927 (PHILIPS CORP [US], et al); | [X]WO8905470 (UNIV KENT STATE OHIO [US], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 146 (P-854)11 April 1989 & JP-A-63 309 917 ( SEIKO EPSON CORP ), & JP63309917 A 19890411 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 328 (E-654)6 September 1988 & JP-A-63 092 192 ( KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD ), & JP63092192 A 19880906 |