EP0472764 - Method for reducing colour noise of a television signal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/10] | Method and apparatus for reducing colour noise of a television signal | ||
[1996/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.1997 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.02.1997 [1997/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche ITT Industries GmbH Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19 79108 Freiburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | For all designated states Deutsche ITT Industries GmbH Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19 D-79108 Freiburg / DE | ||
Former [1992/10] | For all designated states DEUTSCHE ITT INDUSTRIES GMBH Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19 D-79108 Freiburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Désor, Hans-Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. Sonnenwiese 18 D-7803 Gundelfingen 2 / DE | [1992/10] | Application number, filing date | 90116639.7 | 30.08.1990 | [1992/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0472764 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0472764 | Date: | 06.03.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/64 | [1992/10] | CPC: |
H04N9/646 (EP,KR,US);
H04N11/048 (KR);
H04N11/16 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1995/36] |
Former [1992/10] | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Reduktion des Farbrauschens eines Fernsehsignals | [1996/10] | English: | Method for reducing colour noise of a television signal | [1996/10] | French: | Procédé de réduction du bruit d'un signal de télévision couleur | [1996/10] |
Former [1992/10] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Reduktion des Farbrauschens eines Fernsehsignals | ||
Former [1992/10] | Method and apparatus for reducing colour noise of a television signal | ||
Former [1992/10] | Procédé et dispositif de réduction du bruit d'un signal de télévision couleur | Examination procedure | 01.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/44] | 12.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 24.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0194759 (FAROUDJA LAB INC [US]); | [A]US4926361 (OHTSUBO HIROYASU [JP], et al) |