EP0472768 - Method and attaching a chip module to an IC-card [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.1995 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.1995 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.08.1995 [1995/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/10] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beer, Gottfried, Ing. (FH) Waldstrasse 2 D-8411 Etterzhausen / DE | 02 /
Scheuenpflug, Richard, Ing. (FH) Mariaorterstrasse 25 D-8411 Kleinprüfening / DE | [1992/10] | Application number, filing date | 90116690.0 | 30.08.1990 | [1992/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0472768 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077 | [1992/10] | CPC: |
G06K19/07745 (EP);
H01L2924/0002 (EP)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1992/18] |
Former [1992/10] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Befestigen eines Chipmoduls auf einer Chipkarte | [1992/10] | English: | Method and attaching a chip module to an IC-card | [1992/10] | French: | Procédé de fixation d'un module à puce semi-conductrice sur une carte à circuit intégré | [1992/10] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 20.12.1990 | Examination requested [1992/10] | 31.08.1991 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, GB, GR, LU, NL, SE | 23.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.1995 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.10.1991 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.10.1991 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.10.1991 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 07.10.1991 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.10.1991 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 07.10.1991 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 07.10.1991 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.10.1991 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.10.1991 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.10.1991 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0359632 ; | [Y]EP0197847 |