blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0427931

EP0427931 - Discharge installation for a bulk silo [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.06.1992
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip05.06.1992Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.07.1992 [1992/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VEBA KRAFTWERKE RUHR AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Postfach 10 01 25
45801 Gelsenkirchen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1991/21]For all designated states
VEBA KRAFTWERKE RUHR AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Postfach 10 01 25
D-45801 Gelsenkirchen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Hanowski, Klemens, Ing.
Hans-Pfitzner-Strasse 3
D-4270 Dorsten 1 / DE
[1991/21]
Representative(s)Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [1991/21]Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte
Postfach 33 02 29
D-40435 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date90116869.003.09.1990
[1991/21]
Priority number, dateDE1989393768313.11.1989         Original published format: DE 3937683
[1991/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0427931
Date:22.05.1991
Language:DE
[1991/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.03.1991
ClassificationIPC:B65G65/36
[1991/21]
CPC:
B65G65/365 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1991/21]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Entleeren von Schüttgut enthaltenden Silos[1991/21]
English:Discharge installation for a bulk silo[1991/21]
French:Dispositif de déchargement pour silos contenant des produits en vrac[1991/21]
File destroyed:21.02.2000
Examination procedure23.11.1991Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1992/31]
28.02.1992Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [1992/31]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]NL7009882  ;
 [Y]EP0163337  ;
 [Y]FR2535374  ;
 [X]US2649215
 [X]  - MECHANICAL HANDLING, Band 41, Nr. 3, M{rz 1954Seiten 115-121; "Bulk sugar handling"
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.