EP0409291 - Thermoplastic resin composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO., LTD. 11-24, Tsukiji-2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/04] | For all designated states JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO., LTD. 11-24, Tsukiji-2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goto, Kohei Nihon Gosei Gomu Shataku, 1 Morigayamacho, Yokkaichi-shi / JP | 02 /
Komiya, Zen Nihon Gosei Gomu Shataku, 1 Morigayamacho, Yokkaichi-shi / JP | 03 /
Iio, Akira Nihon Gosei Gomu Shataku, 1 Morigayamacho, Yokkaichi-shi / JP | 04 /
Yamahara, Noboru 2, Horiki 1-chome Yokkaichi-shi / JP | [1991/04] | Representative(s) | Clifford, Frederick Alan, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57/60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | [1991/04] | Application number, filing date | 90117635.4 | 15.11.1988 | [1991/04] | Priority number, date | JP19870288527 | 17.11.1987 Original published format: JP 28852787 | JP19870288528 | 17.11.1987 Original published format: JP 28852887 | [1991/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0409291 | Date: | 23.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0409291 | Date: | 29.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0409291 | Date: | 14.02.1996 | [1996/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08G61/08, C08L65/00, C08L25/06, C08L27/06, C08L77/02 | [1991/04] | CPC: |
C08L65/00 (EP,US);
C08G81/00 (KR);
C08G61/08 (EP,US);
G11B7/2538 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L65/00, C08L2666/04 (US,EP);
C08L65/00, C08L2666/14 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/04] | Title | German: | Thermoplastische Harzzusammensetzung | [1991/04] | English: | Thermoplastic resin composition | [1991/04] | French: | Composition de résine thermoplastique | [1991/04] | Examination procedure | 11.10.1990 | Examination requested [1991/04] | 07.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP88310771.6 / EP0317262 | Opposition(s) | 15.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 14.02.1996 | NL | 14.02.1996 | [2003/07] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 14.02.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60049051 ; | [X]EP0105775 (CHARBONNAGES STE CHIMIQUE [FR]); | [E]EP0303246 (GOODRICH CO B F [US]) | [A] - WPIL, FILE SUPPLIER, AN=85-10282, Derwent Publications Ltd, London, GB; & JP-A-60 049 051 (NIPPON ZEON) 18-03-1985, & JP60049051 A 00000000 |