EP0421169 - Catalyst for the oxidation of carbon monoxide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/15] | Low temperature catalytic composite for forming carbon dioxide | ||
[1995/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.03.1996 [1996/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066 Los Angeles, California 90045-0066 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/15] | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066 Los Angeles, California 90045-0066 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moser, Thomas P. 2322A Carnegie Lane Redondo Beach, California 90278 / US | [1991/15] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/15] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 D-85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 90117677.6 | 13.09.1990 | [1991/15] | Priority number, date | US19890417383 | 05.10.1989 Original published format: US 417383 | [1991/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0421169 | Date: | 10.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0421169 | Date: | 22.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/63, B01D53/62, B01D53/94 | [1995/12] | CPC: |
H01S3/036 (EP);
B01J23/40 (EP);
B01J23/63 (EP);
B01J23/6562 (EP);
B01J23/89 (EP);
C01B32/50 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1991/15] | C01B31/20, B01J23/40 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/15] | Title | German: | Katalysator zur Oxydation von Kohlenmonoxid | [1995/12] | English: | Catalyst for the oxidation of carbon monoxide | [1995/12] | French: | Catalyseur d'oxydation du monoxide de carbone | [1995/12] |
Former [1991/15] | Zusammengesetzter Tieftemperatur-Katalysator zur Herstellung von Kohlendioxyd | ||
Former [1991/15] | Low temperature catalytic composite for forming carbon dioxide | ||
Former [1991/15] | Composite catalytique à basse température pour formes de bioxyde de carbone | Examination procedure | 10.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/50] | 09.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6415991 ; | [A]GB1299666 (ENGELHARD MIN & CHEM [US]); | [X]EP0306945 (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890510), vol. 013, no. 195, Database accession no. (E - 754)<3543>, & JP01015991 A 19890119 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) | [A] - NISHINO A. ET AL, "Studies on carbon monoxide oxidizing performance of molded catalyst composed of calcium aluminate-metal oxides. III. Carbon monoxide oxidation on Platinium-palladium catalysts supported on calcium aluminate-silicon dioxide-titaniumdioxide molds", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19870727), vol. 107, no. 4, Database accession no. 27727G, page 277 | [ ] - NIPPON KAGAKU KAISHI, (1987), vol. 4, pages 645 - 653 |