EP0418748 - Shopping trolley [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.1993 [1993/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wanzl GmbH & Co. Entwicklungs-KG Postfach 11 29 D-89336 Leipheim / DE | [1991/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pech, Raimund Weissenhornerstrasse 9 D-8870 Günzburg / DE | 02 /
Wanzl, Rudolf Sonnenweg 8 D-8874 Leipheim / DE | [1991/13] | Application number, filing date | 90117736.0 | 14.09.1990 | [1991/13] | Priority number, date | DE19890011126U | 18.09.1989 Original published format: DE 8911126 U | DE19890011127U | 18.09.1989 Original published format: DE 8911127 U | [1991/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0418748 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B62B3/10 | [1991/13] | CPC: |
B62B5/0006 (EP);
B62B3/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/13] | Title | German: | Einkaufswagen | [1991/13] | English: | Shopping trolley | [1991/13] | French: | Chariot d'achat | [1991/13] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 25.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/31] | 22.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/34] | 31.03.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2488561 ; | [A]US3909034 ; | [A]FR2191630 |