blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0419988

EP0419988 - Enzymatic enantioselective synthesis of S(-) and R(+) esters of 4-hydroxy-1-cyclopentenone and its 2',2'-dimethyl-1',3'-propandiol ketal [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.03.1995
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip06.03.1995Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.04.1995 [1995/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EUROPÄISCHE WIRTSCHAFTSGEMEINSCHAFT (E.W.G.)
Bâtiment Jean Monnet, Plateau du Kirchberg
2920 Luxemburg / LU
[N/P]
Former [1991/14]For all designated states
EUROPÄISCHE WIRTSCHAFTSGEMEINSCHAFT (E.W.G.)
Bâtiment Jean Monnet, Plateau du Kirchberg
L-2920 Luxemburg / LU
Inventor(s)01 / Schapöhler, Stefan
Wilhelm-Busch-Strasse 8-10
W-3000 Hannover 1 / DE
02 / Schügerl, Karl, Prof. Dr.
Arnumer Kirchstrasse 31
W-3005 Hemmingen 4 / DE
03 / Scheper, Thomas, Dr.
Däumlingweg 6
W-3000 Hannover 1 / DE
[1991/14]
Representative(s)Weinmiller, Jürgen
Spott, Weinmiller & Böhm Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1991/14]Weinmiller, Jürgen
Lennéstrasse 9 Postfach 24
D-82336 Feldafing / DE
Application number, filing date90117836.817.09.1990
[1991/14]
Priority number, dateLU1989008759325.09.1989         Original published format: LU 87593
[1991/14]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0419988
Date:03.04.1991
Language:DE
[1991/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.01.1991
ClassificationIPC:C12P41/00, C12P7/62, C12P17/06
[1991/14]
CPC:
C12P7/62 (EP); C12P17/06 (EP); C12P41/004 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1991/14]
TitleGerman:Enantioselektive enzymatische Synthese von S(-)- und R(+)-Estern des 4-Hydroxy-cyclopenten-1-ons und seines 2',2'-Dimethylpropan-1',3'-diol-ketals[1991/14]
English:Enzymatic enantioselective synthesis of S(-) and R(+) esters of 4-hydroxy-1-cyclopentenone and its 2',2'-dimethyl-1',3'-propandiol ketal[1991/14]
French:Synthèse enzymatique enantiosélective d'esters S(-) et R(+) de l'hydroxy-4-cyclopenténone-1 et le diméthyl-2',2'-propandiol-1',3'-kétale de celui-ci[1991/14]
File destroyed:03.03.2001
Examination procedure27.12.1990Examination requested  [1991/14]
13.06.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.10.1994Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1995/17]
25.11.1994Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [1995/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.09.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
20.09.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.199405   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]JP58138386  ;
 [Y]JP1020091  ;
 [Y]JP63000292  ;
 [YD]DE3724721  ;
 [Y]EP0127386
 [Y]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 99, Nr. 25, 19. Dezember 1983, Seite 531, Zusammenfassung Nr. 211169u, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-58 138 386 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO., LTD) 17-08-1983, & JP58138386 A 00000000
 [Y]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 111, Nr. 15, 9. Oktober 1989, Seite 625, Zusammenfassung Nr. 132612w, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-1 020 091 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO.,LTD) 24-01-1989, & JP1020091 A 00000000
 [Y]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 109, Nr. 19, 7. November 1988, Seite 597, Zusammenfassung Nr. 168996x, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-63 000 292 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO., LTD) 05-01-1988, & JP63000292 A 00000000
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.