EP0418869 - Fragnet repartition casing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.12.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.01.1994 [1994/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Nixdorf Informationssysteme Aktiengesellschaft Fürstenallee 7 33102 Paderborn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/01] | For all designated states Siemens Nixdorf Informationssysteme Aktiengesellschaft Fürstenallee 7 D-33102 Paderborn / DE | ||
Former [1991/34] | For all designated states Siemens Nixdorf Informationssysteme AG Fürstenallee 7 D-33102 Paderborn / DE | ||
Former [1991/13] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Walter Parkstrasse 5 D-8902 Neusäss / DE | [1991/13] | Representative(s) | Fuchs, Franz-Josef, et al Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/34] | Fuchs, Franz-Josef, Dr.-Ing., et al Postfach 22 13 17 D-80503 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90118044.8 | 19.09.1990 | [1991/13] | Priority number, date | DE19890011274U | 21.09.1989 Original published format: DE 8911274 U | [1991/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0418869 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0418869 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/14 | [1992/20] | CPC: |
H05K7/1438 (EP);
H02B1/48 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1991/13] | H05K7/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1991/13] | Title | German: | Unternetzverteilergehäuse | [1991/13] | English: | Fragnet repartition casing | [1991/13] | French: | Boîtier de répartiteur de sous-réseau | [1991/13] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 05.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/13] | 26.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/04] | 30.08.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1994/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1993 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4151580 ; | [A]EP0165434 ; | [A]US3992654 |