EP0476176 - Method for constructing panels based on mineral fibres such as glass fibres, rock wool and the like, and panel obtained by the method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EUROFIBRE S.p.A. Via Nazionale 4 I-37046 Minerbe-Verona / IT | [1992/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vaccari, Bruno Via Venier, 15/A I-30020 Marcon, Venezia / IT | [1992/13] | Representative(s) | Piovesana, Paolo c/o Praxi Intellectual Property S.p.A.- Venezia Via Francesco Baracca, 5/A 30173 Venezia-Mestre / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/13] | Piovesana, Paolo Corso del Popolo, 70 I-30172 Venezia-Mestre / IT | Application number, filing date | 90118172.7 | 21.09.1990 | [1992/13] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0476176 | Date: | 25.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0476176 | Date: | 04.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | D04H1/64, D04H1/00 | [1992/13] | CPC: |
D04H1/4218 (EP);
C04B28/26 (EP);
C04B28/344 (EP);
D04H1/00 (EP);
D04H1/4209 (EP);
D04H1/64 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C04B28/26, C04B14/38, C04B24/42, C04B40/0028, C04B40/0071, C04B40/0263 (EP);
C04B28/344, C04B14/38, C04B24/42, C04B40/0028, C04B40/0071, C04B40/0263 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren für die Plattenherstellung aus Mineralfasern, wie Glasfasern, Steinwolle u.a., und nach diesem Verfahren erzeugte Platten | [1992/13] | English: | Method for constructing panels based on mineral fibres such as glass fibres, rock wool and the like, and panel obtained by the method | [1992/13] | French: | Méthode pour la réalisation de panneaux en fibres minérales, telles que fibres de verre, de roche ou semblable et panneaux obtenus par cette méthode | [1992/13] | Examination procedure | 16.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/47] | 02.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 04.12.1996 | DK | 04.12.1996 | ES | 04.12.1996 | GR | 04.12.1996 | NL | 04.12.1996 | SE | 04.03.1997 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/24] | BE | 04.12.1996 | |
DK | 04.12.1996 | ||
ES | 04.12.1996 | ||
GR | 04.12.1996 | ||
SE | 04.03.1997 | ||
Former [2000/04] | BE | 04.12.1996 | |
DK | 04.12.1996 | ||
GR | 04.12.1996 | ||
SE | 04.03.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | BE | 04.12.1996 | |
DK | 04.12.1996 | ||
SE | 04.03.1997 | ||
Former [1998/11] | BE | 04.12.1996 | |
SE | 04.03.1997 | ||
Former [1997/40] | BE | 04.12.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB822639 (BABCOCK & WILCOX CO); | [A]US2994630 (OSBORN ROBERT O); | [Y]US3017318 ; | [Y]EP0350240 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) | by applicant | GB822639 | US2994630 | US3017318 |