EP0421213 - Chromium containing magnetic iron oxide pigments process for their fabrication and their application [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.1994 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.06.1994 [1994/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TODA KOGYO CORP. 7-1 Yokogawa-Shinmachi Nishi-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/04] | For all designated states TODA KOGYO CORP. 7-1 Yokogawa-Shinmachi Nishi-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima-ken / JP | ||
Former [1991/15] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gerum, Johannes, Dr. Robert-Koch-Strasse 38 D-8901 Stadtbergen / DE | 02 /
Wimbersky, Werner, Dr. Pilsenseestrasse 17 D-8000 München 70 / DE | 03 /
Kathrein, Hendrik, Dr. Guertelweg 4 D-4053 Juechen-Aldenhoven / DE | 04 /
van Bonn, Karl-Heinz, Dr. Vinngrabenstrasse 44 D-4130 Moers / DE | 05 /
Woditsch, Peter, Dr. Deswatinesstrasse 83 D-4150 Krefeld / DE | [1991/15] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/02] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90118256.8 | 22.09.1990 | [1991/15] | Priority number, date | DE19893933183 | 04.10.1989 Original published format: DE 3933183 | [1991/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0421213 | Date: | 10.04.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0421213 | Date: | 09.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/706, G11B5/712 | [1991/15] | CPC: |
C09C1/24 (KR);
G11B5/70647 (EP);
G11B5/70657 (EP);
G11B5/712 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/15] | Title | German: | Chromhaltige magnetische Eisenoxidpigmente, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung sowie deren Verwendung | [1991/15] | English: | Chromium containing magnetic iron oxide pigments process for their fabrication and their application | [1991/15] | French: | Pigments magnétiques d'oxyde de fer contenant du chrome, son procédé de fabrication et son utilisation | [1991/15] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 22.09.1990 | Examination requested [1991/15] | 26.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/25] | 02.02.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP62295217 ; | [A]GB2064502 (ICI AUSTRALIA LTD, et al); | [A]GB999385 (RCA CORP) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 188 (P-711)2. Juni 1988 & JP-A-62 295 217 (HITACHI MAXWELL LTD ) 22. Dezember 1987, & JP62295217 A 00000000 |