EP0420185 - Semiconductor memory apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.11.1996 [1996/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | For all designated states TOSHIBA MICRO-ELECTRONICS CORPORATION 25-1, Ekimaehoncho Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/14] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states TOSHIBA MICRO-ELECTRONICS CORPORATION 25-1, Ekimaehoncho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ogihara, Masaki, c/o Intellectual Property Div. Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP | 02 /
Fujii, Syuso, c/o Intellectual Property Div. Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP | [1991/14] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/14] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90118467.1 | 26.09.1990 | [1991/14] | Priority number, date | JP19890249087 | 27.09.1989 Original published format: JP 24908789 | [1991/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0420185 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0420185 | Date: | 04.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0420185 | Date: | 15.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G11C8/00 | [1992/45] | CPC: |
G11C8/14 (EP,US);
G11C11/401 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1991/14] | G11C5/06, G11C8/00, G11C7/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/14] | Title | German: | Halbleiterspeicheranordnung | [1991/14] | English: | Semiconductor memory apparatus | [1991/14] | French: | Dispositif de mémoire à semi-conducteurs | [1991/14] | Examination procedure | 26.09.1990 | Examination requested [1991/14] | 03.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP61274357 ; | [A]EP0055572 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | [A]US4733374 (FURUYAMA TOHRU [JP], et al); | [AP]JPH0264990 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 130 (E-502)23 April 1987 & JP-A-61 274 357 ( TOSHIBA ) 4 December 1986, & JP61274357 A 19861204 |