EP0421287 - Hollow body set going by pressure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.04.1995 [1995/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Aktiengesellschaft Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/06] | For all designated states Continental Aktiengesellschaft Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 D-30165 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [1991/15] | For all designated states Continental Aktiengesellschaft Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 D-30165 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bethge, Michael, Dipl.Ing. Marienbaderstrasse 3 D-3000 Hannover 71 / DE | [1991/15] | Application number, filing date | 90118634.6 | 28.09.1990 | [1991/15] | Priority number, date | DE19893933249 | 05.10.1989 Original published format: DE 3933249 | [1991/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0421287 | Date: | 10.04.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0421287 | Date: | 27.04.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/46, F16L17/10, E06B7/23 | [1991/15] | CPC: |
E06B7/2318 (EP);
F16J15/46 (EP);
F16L17/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1991/15] | Title | German: | Durch Druck aktivierbares Hohlprofil | [1991/15] | English: | Hollow body set going by pressure | [1991/15] | French: | Corps creux actionné par pression | [1991/15] | Examination procedure | 25.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/25] | 13.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]DE8806085U ; | [A]DE1166154 ; | [A]US3222076 (HOLLINGSWORTH ALBERT A); | [A]GB1348886 (SMITHS INDUSTRIES LTD) | [X] - AUTOMOTIVE ENGINEERING, Band 96, Nr. 7, Juli 1988, Seiten 33-38, Warrendale, US; "Novel sealing elements from elastomers" |